Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Rocca

Deceased

Bishop of Ischia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹BornCatane
12 Sep 167240.6AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
9 Oct 167240.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
6 Jun 169159.4DiedBishop of Ischia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Rocca:
Bishop Gerolamo Rocca (died ) Bishop of Ischia

  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 230
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 12 Apr 2015