Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Niccolò Roberti

Deceased

Archbishop of Soltania (Soltaniyeh)


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Feb 1393AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
25 May 1393Ordained BishopBishop of Ferrara, Italy
24 Jan 1401AppointedArchbishop of Soltania (Soltaniyeh), Iran

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Roberti:
Archbishop Niccolò Roberti Archbishop of Soltania (Soltaniyeh)

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 248, and Page 457

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013