Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lorenzo Reynoso

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Aug 1651SelectedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
19 Feb 1652ConfirmedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
25 Feb 1652Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
1 Mar 1656DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Reynoso
Archbishop Lorenzo Reynoso (died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara, Spain

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 123
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 181, Number 1,128
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,652, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast