Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Mortival

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Jun 1315SelectedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
28 Sep 1315Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
14 Mar 1330DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Roger Mortival
Bishop Roger Mortival (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 435
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 71
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 600

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast