Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Barni

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Spain

Cardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1676Born
14 Jan 173154.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 173154.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
22 Feb 173154.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
1 Apr 173154.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
1 Apr 173962.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
9 Sep 174366.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 174670.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
24 Jan 175477.2DiedCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Barni (VIAF: 68306449)
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Barni (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Spain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLodi, Diocese of Lodi, Italy
Ordained BishopBasilica, Loreto
Death PlaceFerrara, Archdiocese of Ferrara, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Giorgio Chapel, Cathedral, Ferrara, Archdiocese of Ferrara, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Blessed Virgin Chapel, Cathedral, Ferrara, Archdiocese of Ferrara, Italy

  • a priest for 23.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
  • a cardinal for 10.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die BischŲfe der Deutschsprachigen Lšnder
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,731, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 205
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 233
  • ob: CB, 9 Sep 2019
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast