Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Reluz, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1636Born
27 Mar 169760.2AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
19 May 169760.4Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
12 Jun 170669.4DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Reluz
Bishop Tomás Reluz O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiempozuelos

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 300
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 239, Number 1,482
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast