Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Castaneola Marino

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1572AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
15 Mar 1573Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
25 Feb 1583DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Castaneola Marino
Bishop Vincenzo Castaneola Marino (died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast