Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Ramírez y Vázquez

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1807BornSalvatierra de los Barros
Jun 1832³24.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 186557.5SelectedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
25 Sep 186557.8ConfirmedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
4 Feb 186658.1Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
14 Nov 189082.9DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Ramírez y Vázquez:
Bishop Fernando Ramírez y Vázquez (born , died ) Bishop of Badajoz

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 433
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 172, Number 949

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015