Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Rabbia, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618¹Born
28 Sep 167153.7AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
4 Oct 167153.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
19 Jan 167254.0DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Rabbia
Bishop Giovanni Battista Rabbia C.R. (born 1618, died ) Bishop of Lodi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 238
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast