Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Maurice René Quéguiner, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of La Société des Missions Etrangères


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1909BornPloujean, France
29 Jun 193223.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
7 Aug 196051.1AppointedSuperior General of La Société des Missions Etrangères
1974²64.5ResignedSuperior General of La Société des Missions Etrangères
2 Sep 197768.1DiedSuperior General Emeritus of La Société des Missions Etrangères

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maurice René Quéguiner:
Priest Maurice René Quéguiner M.E.P. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of La Société des Missions Etrangères

  • a priest for 45.2 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 25 Nov 2013