Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzio Lessio

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1668³Born
7 Mar 169324.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 171345.2AppointedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
2 Oct 171951.0AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
Aug 1729³60.9DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzio Lessio
Bishop Vincenzio Lessio (born , died Aug 1729) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCurzola

  • a priest for 36.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 95, and Page 407
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast