Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich von Plankenfels

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1450SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
23 Mar 1450ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
31 May 1450Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
24 May 1457DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Plankenfels (VIAF: 74928099)
Bishop Friedrich von Plankenfels (died ) Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 220
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,592
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1450, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast