Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Baptiste Avanian, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1648³BornAbarana
25 Jan 166718.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Mar 169243.8AppointedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
1701¹52.6DiedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Baptiste Avanian:
Archbishop Paul Baptiste Avanian O.P. (born , died 1701) Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 281
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015