Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent Elias Mouton (Mutton), O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ispahan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1643BornMons, Belgium
8 Apr 169552.1AppointedBishop of Ispahan, Iran
30 Dec 169653.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ispahan, Iran
3 Nov 170865.7DiedBishop of Ispahan, Iran

MicroData Summary for Laurent Elias Mouton (Mutton):
Bishop Laurent Elias Mouton (Mutton) O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Ispahan

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 101
  • ob/c2: CB, 1 May 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015