Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James O’Phelan

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622¹BornKilkenny
Mar 164422.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 166947.1AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
11 Aug 166947.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
Jan 1695³73.0DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James O’Phelan:
Bishop James O’Phelan (born 1622, died Jan 1695) Bishop of Ossory

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015