Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Maria Pescatori, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gallipoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1690BornParma
21 May 171222.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Feb 171423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Jun 173949.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
28 Jun 173949.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
10 Dec 174050.6SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Gallipoli, Italy
6 Mar 174150.9ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Gallipoli, Italy
14 Jan 174756.7DiedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Pescatori:
Archbishop Antonio Maria Pescatori O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Gallipoli

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 209, and Page 222
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015