Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume de Pélissier, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orange


Events

DateEventTitle
1510²SelectedBishop of Orange, France
16 Apr 1510³Ordained BishopBishop of Orange, France
4 Nov 1513ConfirmedBishop of Orange, France
1522¹ResignedBishop of Orange, France
19 Nov 1532DiedBishop Emeritus of Orange, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Pélissier:
Bishop Guillaume de Pélissier O.S.A. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orange

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 123
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013