Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Paternione (Paternò), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jan 1479AppointedBishop of Malta
31 Jan 1479Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
6 Jul 1489AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
1511¹DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Paternione (Paternò)
Archbishop Giovanni Paternione (Paternò) O.S.B. (died 1511) Archbishop of Palermo

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo in Lucina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 192, and Page 211
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1479, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 29 Nov 2018

Quantcast