Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Zeno

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Bishop of Vicenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1439¹BornVenice
21 Nov 146829.8Elevated to Cardinal
22 Nov 146829.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
Mar 1470²31.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
18 Mar 147031.2AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
8 Oct 147940.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
8 May 150162.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Zeno:
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Zeno (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a cardinal for 32.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Nov 1468

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015