Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Olgiati

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1660Born
7 Jun 169332.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Jun 169332.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 169433.9AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
21 Nov 169433.9Ordained BishopBishop of Parma, Italy
26 Jan 171150.1AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
23 Sep 173574.7ResignedBishop of Como, Italy
29 Jul 173675.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Olgiati
Bishop Giuseppe Olgiati (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 166, and Page 308
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast