Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr z Chrząstowa (Chrząstowski)

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Mar 1436AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
15 Aug 1436Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
19 Jan 1452DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Piotr z Chrząstowa (Chrząstowski)
Bishop Piotr z Chrząstowa (Chrząstowski) (died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

EventPlace
Ordained BishopMonastery, Pinczów

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 219
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,191
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 4,165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast