Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berthold von Oberg, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany

Titular Bishop of Banados


Events

DateEventTitle
13 May 1468AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
13 May 1468AppointedTitular Bishop of Banados
26 May 1468Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Banados
1478¹AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
1480¹ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
4 Aug 1494DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Berthold von Oberg (VIAF: 316495329)
Bishop Berthold von Oberg O.P. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHopital Teutonique, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 211
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,497
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1468, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Nov 2018

Quantcast