Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Mar 1463AppointedBishop of Castro [del Lazio], Italy
30 Oct 1467AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
18 Oct 1473DiedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio
Bishop Antonio (died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 121, and Page 166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017