Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henning von Haus

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Sep 1471SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
15 Jan 1472ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
14 Jun 1472Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
Nov 1480³ResignedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
10 Apr 1488DiedBishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henning von Haus
Bishop Henning von Haus (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,615
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 165
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1472, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast