Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentin Mohr, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1560BornHornhausen
158726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
31 Jul 160645.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
31 Jul 160645.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
8 Jul 160746.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
21 Oct 160847.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Valentin Mohr:
Bishop Valentin Mohr O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 21.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 96
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015