Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph de Montfalcon du Cénole

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1732BornSaint-Offenge-Dessous
24 May 175523.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 178553.1SelectedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
27 Jun 178553.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
15 Aug 178553.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
22 Sep 179361.6DiedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

MicroData Summary for Joseph de Montfalcon du Cénole:
Archbishop Joseph de Montfalcon du Cénole (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 392
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,499
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016