Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Heinrich Milz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

Titular Bishop of Sarepta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1763BornKoblenz
23 Dec 178623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
19 Dec 182562.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
19 Dec 182562.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
23 Apr 182662.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
29 Apr 183369.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Heinrich Milz (VIAF: 89935326)
Bishop Johann Heinrich Milz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jun 2016