Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José do Menino Jesus (Deus), O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal

Note/Previous Titular See: (a Puero Iesu)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1735³Born
1 Mar 176125.5ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
20 Jun 178044.9SelectedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
18 Sep 178045.1ConfirmedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
30 Nov 178045.3Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
9 Apr 178347.7SelectedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
18 Jul 178347.9ConfirmedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
14 Jan 179155.4DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José do Menino Jesus (Deus)
Bishop José do Menino Jesus (Deus) O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Viseu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJacobina

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 39
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 268, and Page 443

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast