Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio Corrêa, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1721BornPorto, Portugal
12 Jun 174624.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
19 Jun 174624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
27 Sep 177957.9SelectedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
13 Dec 177958.1ConfirmedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
9 Apr 178058.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
12 Jul 180280.7DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Corrêa:
Archbishop Antônio Corrêa O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 364

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016