Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernst von Mengersdorf

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1554Born
2 Sep 158328.8SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
21 Nov 158329.0ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
20 May 158429.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
21 Oct 159136.9DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ernst von Mengersdorf (VIAF: 30336886)
Bishop Ernst von Mengersdorf (born , died ) Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBamberg, Diocese of Bamberg
Ordained BishopBamberg, Diocese of Bamberg

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,828
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 128
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1584, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 20 Nov 2017