Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás de Berlanga, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1486BornBerlanga del Duero, Spain
11 Feb 153448.1AppointedBishop of Panamá
17 May 153448.4Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
30 Jul 153448.6InstalledBishop of Panamá
1537²51.0ResignedBishop of Panamá
8 Aug 155165.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Panamá

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás de Berlanga:
Bishop Tomás de Berlanga O.P. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Panamá

  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 45, Number 227
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 17 Nov 2013