Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Mendes de Carvalho

Deceased

Bishop of Elvas, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jun 1570AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
16 Sep 1571Ordained BishopBishop of Elvas, Portugal
9 Jan 1591DiedBishop of Elvas, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Antonio Mendes de Carvalho
Bishop Antonio Mendes de Carvalho (died ) Bishop of Elvas

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Vicente de Fora, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 192
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1571, Number 12
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Number 5,528

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast