Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Tarcisio Martina, C.S.S. †

Deceased

Prefect of Yixian [Yihsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1887Born
1904²16.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
6 Aug 191123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
22 Oct 192942.0AppointedSuperior of Yihsien [Yixian], China
3 Jan 193648.2AppointedPrefect of Yixian [Yihsien], China
12 Nov 196174.1DiedPrefect of Yixian [Yihsien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tarcisio Martina
Father Tarcisio Martina C.S.S. (born , died ) Prefect of Yixian [Yihsien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGemona, Archdiocese of Udine, Italy
Death PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona, Italy

  • a priest for 50.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast