Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Martinelli, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Venafro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1587³Born
18 Aug 162538.5AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
24 Aug 162538.6Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
20 Sep 163245.6AppointedBishop of Venafro, Italy
10 Sep 163548.6DiedBishop of Venafro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Martinelli
Bishop Vincenzo Martinelli O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Venafro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 163, and Page 361
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 May 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast