Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von Mariasall

Deceased

Bishop of Seckau, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
Aug 1231³AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
30 May 1232Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
7 Oct 1243DiedBishop of Seckau, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Mariasall
Bishop Heinrich von Mariasall (died ) Bishop of Seckau

EventPlace
Ordained BishopKärnten, Friesach

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 441
  • b/c2+: ATh, 12 Oct 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,534

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast