Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Alfonso Manzanedo de Quiñones

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1552¹Born
26 Oct 162270.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
8 Dec 162270.9Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
13 Nov 162775.8DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Manzanedo de Quiñones:
Patriarch Alfonso Manzanedo de Quiñones (died ) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 203
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 78, Number 459
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 142, Number 904

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015