Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovan Giorgio Mainardi

Deceased

Bishop of Ripatransone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629¹BornAcona
20 Mar 166132.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 168051.1AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
17 Mar 168051.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
Nov 1693³64.8DiedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovan Giorgio Mainardi:
Bishop Giovan Giorgio Mainardi (born 1629, died Nov 1693) Bishop of Ripatransone

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015