Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Magnani, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jun 1505³Born
1551²45.5AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1559²53.5CeasedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
17 Jul 156055.1AppointedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
28 Jul 156055.1Ordained BishopBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
25 Sep 156560.3DiedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Magnani
Bishop Giulio Magnani O.F.M. Conv. (born Jun 1505, died ) Bishop of Calvi Risorta

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiacenza, Diocese of Piacenza
Ordained BishopSanti Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceTeano, Diocese of Teano
Buried Place (Original)San Francesco, Church, Teano, Diocese of Teano

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 148
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 56*
  • b/d/ob/c2+: AT, 6 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Jan 2019

Quantcast