Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthur Magennis, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Mar 1647AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
10 May 1648Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
24 Mar 1653DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Arthur Magennis
Bishop Arthur Magennis O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Ordained BishopKilkenny

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 178
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 14
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 30 Aug 2020

Quantcast