Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan del Campo

Deceased

Bishop of León


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Aug 1327AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
27 Sep 1327Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
7 May 1328AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
2 Dec 1332AppointedBishop of León, Spain
24 May 1344DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan del Campo:
Bishop Juan del Campo (died ) Bishop of León

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 302, Number 148
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 200, and Page 382

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 28 Jan 2014