Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Cherigato (Chierepati), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1482Born
11 May 152846.0AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
24 Aug 152846.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
1551¹68.6ResignedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
4 Jul 157391.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Cherigato (Chierepati)
Archbishop Luigi Cherigato (Chierepati) O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bar (Antivari)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceVicenza, Diocese of Vicenza, Italy

  • a bishop for 44.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1528, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 Jun 2018

Quantcast