Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Feliks Ligęza

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500¹Born
7 Jan 155555.0AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
11 Jun 155555.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
26 Feb 156060.1DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Feliks Ligęza
Archbishop Feliks Ligęza (born 1500, died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPiotrków Trybunalski
Death PlaceDunajowie

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,336
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1555, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast