Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Liberati

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Ephesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹Born
24 Feb 168873.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
25 Apr 168873.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
18 Apr 170388.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Liberati (VIAF: 100200216)
Archbishop Francesco Liberati (born 1615, died ) Titular Archbishop of Ephesus

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast