Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselm le Gras, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint David’s, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Apr 1229AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
9 Feb 1231Ordained BishopBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
1247²DiedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anselm le Gras
Bishop Anselm le Gras O.F.M. (died 1247) Bishop of Saint David’s

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 57
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 291
  • ofm: CB, 20 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Mar 2016