Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Richard le Grant

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
23 May 1229AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
10 Jun 1229Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
3 Aug 1231DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard le Grant
Archbishop Richard le Grant (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 57
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast