Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elias of Radnor

Deceased

Bishop of Llandaff, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1230AppointedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
1 Dec 1230Ordained BishopBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
13 May 1240DiedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Elias of Radnor:
Bishop Elias of Radnor (died ) Bishop of Llandaff

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 57
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013