Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe de Lévis

Deceased

Bishop of Mirepoix, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1466²Born
6 Apr 149327.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mirepoix, France
22 May 149731.3AppointedBishop of Mirepoix, France
17 Sep 149731.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mirepoix, France
28 Aug 1537³71.6DiedBishop of Mirepoix, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe de Lévis
Bishop Philippe de Lévis (born 1466, died ) Bishop of Mirepoix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteau, Lagarde
Ordained BishopS. Benoit, Cathedral, Castres, Diocese of Castres
Death PlaceMirepoix, Diocese of Mirepoix

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 246
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1497, Number 11
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,178

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 29 Jul 2020

Quantcast