Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Pierre de Narbonne, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vabres, France


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Apr 1486AppointedBishop of Vabres, France
25 Mar 1487Ordained BishopBishop of Vabres, France
21 Jul 1499DiedBishop of Vabres, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine Pierre de Narbonne
Bishop Antoine Pierre de Narbonne O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Vabres

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Elne, Diocese of Elne

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 261
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,018
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 310, Number 202
  • ob: CB, 4 Aug 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1487, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast