Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis de Bar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Oct 1468AppointedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
20 Nov 1471AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
9 Mar 1495AppointedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
1508¹ResignedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
31 May 1517DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Denis de Bar
Bishop Denis de Bar (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 269
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 212, and Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Aug 2018

Quantcast