Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Domenico Leoni

Deceased

Bishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1678³Born
22 Aug 170122.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jul 171435.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Budua (Budva), Montenegro
14 Jan 172243.3AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
1 Feb 172243.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
Dec 1727²49.2DiedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Domenico Leoni
Bishop Bernardo Domenico Leoni (born , died Dec 1727) Bishop of Nona (Nin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKottar

  • a priest for 26.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 129, and Page 292
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast